Seviour, Rosann Ellen (CPSO#: 65872)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001