Seward, William Charles Cross (CPSO#: 23731)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 579 Fieldstone Drive Kingston, ON K7K 0B9
Date Received: 23 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015