Sewchand, Kenneth (CPSO#: 24029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
849 Alexander Court
Suite 304
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 743-5391
Fax: (705) 745-1101
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1000 DePalma Dr
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 31, 2012, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kenneth Sewchand, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Sewchand has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sewchand has voluntarily ceased to perform sinus surgery.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On June 13, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Peterborough, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Sewchand.