Sewchand, Lionel Satyanand (CPSO#: 56205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G8
Phone: (905) 662-5525
Fax: (905) 662-1855
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel S. Sewchand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sewchand ( CPSO# 56205 )

Business Address:
2 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G8
Phone Number: (905) 662-5525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIONEL SATYANAND SEWCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEWCHAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jul 2001
Summary:

 On July 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sewchand(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with respect to conduct unbecoming a physician.  The Discipline 
 Committee ordered the following:

1)	A reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register
2)	A three-month suspension, commencing April 30, 2002 which will be suspended if Dr. 
 	Sewchand completes a course in Physician Boundaries and Anger Management approved 	by the College 
 by April 30, 2002.
3)	Costs of $2,500.00 to be paid to the College by December 31, 2001.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2001