Sexton, Frederick George (CPSO#: 27795)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick George Sexton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2015:

Dr. Sexton has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.