Sexton, Patrick Hugh (CPSO#: 27757)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick H. Sexton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 416.398.0638 or 1.888.563.3732 Fax: 877.398.5932
Date Received: 28 Aug 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012