Sexton, Tracy Lynne (CPSO#: 77742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tracy Sexton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sexton ( CPSO# 77742 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNNE SEXTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEXTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007