Seybold, William Davidson (CPSO#: 51619)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.D. Seybold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 2 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 5 389 Main Street Picton ON K0K 2T0
Date Received: 25 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016