Seyler, Susan Joy Steinmann (CPSO#: 63781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7-421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 570-1655
Fax: (519) 570-3477
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JOY STEINMANN SEYLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992