Seyone, Chanthirasekaram (CPSO#: 64818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Zambia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
Department of Psychiatry, MP-7-427
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5009
Fax: (416) 603-5292
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

March of Dimes Canada
75 Cooperage Street
Toronto ON  M5A 0J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 238-5868 Ext. 6401
Fax: (647) 689-2584
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

PHD ABIS
176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 949-4411
Fax: (905) 949-4019
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

CHIRS
62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 7G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 240-8000
Fax: (416) 240-1149
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

YSBIS
13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges ON  L4E 3S8
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-3038
Fax: (905) 773-5176
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seyone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seyone ( CPSO# 64818 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
Room MP 7-427
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5009

Business Address:
176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3G1
Phone Number: (905) 949-4411

Business Address:
62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 7G1
Phone Number: (416) 240-8000

Business Address:
13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges ON  L4W 3S8
Phone Number: (905) 773-3038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Feb 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTHIRASEKARAM SEYONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 04 Feb 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 04 Feb 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 04 Feb 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Feb 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1997