Shaaban, Amr Hussein Mahmoud Ahmed (CPSO#: 85231)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Shaaban Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2012