Shaban, Joseph Abdul-Halim (CPSO#: 33214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1883 Turner Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3K2
Phone: (519) 977-6050
Fax: (519) 977-6057
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Shaban Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shaban ( CPSO# 33214 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Western Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4443

Business Address:
1883 Turner Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3K2
Phone Number: (519) 977-6050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ABDUL-HALIM SHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1982