Shabana, Wael Mansour (CPSO#: 87867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Nov 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Dutch, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Hospital
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-6111
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Shabana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Shabana ( CPSO# 87867 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-6911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Wael Mansour Shabana may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which Dr. Shabana holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when Dr.Shabana no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.