Shad, Nabila Mahmood (CPSO#: 66955)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Oct 2000