Shadowitz, Melinda Sue (CPSO#: 66956)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Nov 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 2007