Shadowitz, Steven Brian (CPSO#: 61126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
C Wing Room 410
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4290
Fax: (416) 480-4563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Shadowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shadowitz ( CPSO# 61126 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
C Wing Room 410
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN BRIAN SHADOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHADOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1990