Shafai-Sarshar, Roshan (CPSO#: 68158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: Shafai, Roshan Sarshar (used until: 15 Dec 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 503
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 385-9778
Fax: (416) 385-0423
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSHAN SHAFAI-SARSHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFAI-SARSHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998