Shafir, Cary (CPSO#: 67091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shafir & S. Brodovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shafir ( CPSO# 67091 )
Dr. M. Shafir ( CPSO# 60641 )
Dr. S. Brodovsky ( CPSO# 66781 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARY SHAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995