Shafir, Mark (CPSO#: 60641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Ext. 2200
Fax: (519) 740-4921
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shafir & S. Brodovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shafir ( CPSO# 67091 )
Dr. M. Shafir ( CPSO# 60641 )
Dr. S. Brodovsky ( CPSO# 66781 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350


Corporation Name: Mark Shafir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shafir ( CPSO# 60641 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK SHAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990