Shaghouli, Amna Ali Hassan (CPSO#: 79580)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leeds, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2003 to 22 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 04 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 04 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2005 to 04 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2006 to 04 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2007 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008