Shah, Akber (CPSO#: 93187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Sind Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
384 yonge street unit 5
Barrie ON  L4N 4C9
Phone: 705 7260966
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1910 kenedy rd unit 5and 6
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-9007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akber Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shah ( CPSO# 93187 )

Business Address:
384 Yonge Street
Unit 5
Barrie ON  L4N 4C8
Phone Number: (705) 726-0966

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKBER SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013