Shah, Baiju Ramnik (CPSO#: 71353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H145
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5914
Fax: (416) 480-4250
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baiju Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shah ( CPSO# 71353 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H145
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAIJU RAMNIK SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001