Shah, Bharatkumar Kanaiyalal (CPSO#: 51623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2780 Jane Street
Suite 206
Downsview ON  M3N 2J2
Phone: (416) 743-3419
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 6
1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 794-7979
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. B. and S. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shah ( CPSO# 51623 )
Dr. S. Shah ( CPSO# 33758 )
Dr. R. Shah ( CPSO# 95767 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
2780 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 743-3419

Business Address:
6 - 1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 794-7979

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHARATKUMAR KANAIYALAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1984