Shah, Chintankumar Champaklal (CPSO#: 87401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:B. J. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Dr West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: (905) 497-7707
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 9055212100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shah ( CPSO# 87401 )

Business Address:
965 Bovaird Drive West
Unit 11 & 12
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINTANKUMAR CHAMPAKLAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 05 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2008 to 05 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2009 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2011 to 05 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013