Shah, Jay Kishore (CPSO#: 58702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department Of Neonatology
4F- 1PHealth Science Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76342
Fax: (905) 521-5007
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY KISHORE SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1992