Shah, Manish Dev (CPSO#: 79466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone: (416) 499-5558
Fax: (416) 499-9392
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shah Samanta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shah ( CPSO# 79466 )
Dr. T. Samanta ( CPSO# 81578 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6625

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6479

Business Address:
402 - 685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISH DEV SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009