Shah, Meera (CPSO#: 86679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

45 Overlea Blvd, Unit B7
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 421-6369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

45 Overlea Blvd, Unit B7
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 421-6369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meera Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shah ( CPSO# 86679 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2011

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
B7 - 45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 421-6369

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011