Shah, Mruna Mona (CPSO#: 70402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200B
1105E Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-6458
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mruna Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shah ( CPSO# 70402 )

Business Address:
Building E
Suite 200B
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MRUNA MONA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998