Shah, Prakash Ambalal (CPSO#: 22476)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 2006