Shah, Pravin Chinubhai (CPSO#: 27676)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.C. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013