Shah, Rajiv Robert (CPSO#: 69885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
5th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 867-7478
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-1900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

410 Sherbourne
4th floor
St Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Canada
Phone: 416-867-3725
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV ROBERT SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001