Shah, Sameer (CPSO#: 92893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Dhirani, Salim Shah (used until: 14 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castlemore Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone: (905) 799-2273
Fax: (905) 799-2467
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012