Shah, Shreyans (CPSO#: 95442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street, Unit B
Ottawa ON  K1R7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHREYANS SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017