Shah, Tara (CPSO#: 28555)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Dhirani, Tahera Husain (used until: 08 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara Dhirani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014