Shah, Vinod Hemraj (CPSO#: 56337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vinod Hemraj Shah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 28, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Shah’s standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Shah was required to complete a clinical preceptorship and undergo a practice reassessment.

Prior to completing the practice reassessment, Dr. Shah resigned from the College effective May 31, 2017 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.