Shah, Zafar Ali (CPSO#: 23917)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Sep 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
Resident 1 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016