Shahani, Rohan (CPSO#: 81127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: (905) 832-8428
Fax: (905) 832-6651
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shahani ( CPSO# 81127 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2630 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 832-8428

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHAN SHAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009