Shahcheraghi, Gholam Hossain (CPSO#: 51625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Pahlavi University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nemazi Hospital
PO Box: 315-71955
Shiraz 7187813767
Iran
Phone: 987136240678
Fax: 98-713 6490433
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHOLAM HOSSAIN SHAHCHERAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHCHERAGHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1983