Shaheen, Uzma (CPSO#: 77120)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 07 May 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2004