Shahi, Bahram (CPSO#: 66381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 130
100 Renfrew Drive
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Phone: 905-948-9119
Fax: 905-948-8358
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahram Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2010


Corporation Name: Bahram Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shahi ( CPSO# 66381 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
100 Renfrew Drive
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Phone Number: (905) 948-9119

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHRAM SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998