Shahi, Tahereh (CPSO#: 88061)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shiraz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2009