Shahid, Mohammad (CPSO#: 111314)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 03 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2017 to 28 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2017