Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shahin, Rita Myriam (CPSO#: 60074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 338-7924
Fax: (416) 392-0047
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA MYRIAM SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988