Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour, Shahriar (CPSO#: 80484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite D716
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5554
Fax: (416) 480-7832
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahriar Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour ( CPSO# 80484 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite D716
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRIAR SHAHROKHI EBRAHIMIPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHROKHI EBRAHIMIPOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2004 to 25 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006