Shaikh, Omer Sharif (CPSO#: 87635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rainbow Pediatrics
Unit 2
2 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone: (905) 646-5437
Fax: (905) 646-5438
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omer Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shaikh ( CPSO# 87635 )

Business Address:
2 - 2 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone Number: (905) 646-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Omer  Sharif  Shaikh  may  practise medicine independently in Paediatrics,
            only.