Shaikh, Rawabi Mohammad (CPSO#: 87144)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2007 to 02 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008