Shaikh, Shagufta Yasmin (CPSO#: 66850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 406
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-9598
Fax: (416) 492-7921
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Yasmin Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh ( CPSO# 66850 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 492-9598

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAGUFTA YASMIN SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995