Shakeel, Nazneen (CPSO#: 108497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sind, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Great Lakes Medical Centre
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2S5
Phone: (905) 494-0302
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nazneen Shakeel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shakeel ( CPSO# 108497)

Business Address:
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L5R 2S8
Phone Number: (905) 494-0302

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SHAKEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKEEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 31 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2017