Shaker, Hassan Sayed Hassan (CPSO#: 70893)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997