Shakhatreh, Hala Dafi Saleem (CPSO#: 81833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 682-2207
Fax: (905) 682-1793
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA DAFI SALEEM SHAKHATREH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKHATREH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010